Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Karl Cardinal Lehmann

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mainz, Germany

Cardinal-Priest of San Leone I


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1936Born
10 Oct 196327.4Ordained PriestPriest of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
21 Jun 198347.0AppointedBishop of Mainz, Germany
2 Oct 198347.3Ordained BishopBishop of Mainz, Germany
21 Feb 200164.7Elevated to Cardinal
21 Feb 200164.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Leone I
24 May 200165.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Leone I
16 May 201680.0RetiredBishop of Mainz, Germany
11 Mar 201881.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Karl Lehmann (VIAF: 54150508)
Karl Cardinal Lehmann (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mainz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSigmaringen
Death PlaceMainz, Diocese of Mainz

  • a priest for 54.4 years
  • a bishop for 34.4 years
  • a cardinal for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 16 May 2016
  • d: CB, 11 Mar 2018
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 235, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 8 Apr 2018