Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Oskar Saier

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Freiburg im Breisgau


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1932BornWagensteig
2 Jun 195724.8Ordained PriestPriest of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
7 Apr 197239.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
7 Apr 197239.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Rubicon
29 Jun 197239.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rubicon
15 Mar 197845.5AppointedArchbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
3 May 197845.7InstalledArchbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
1 Jul 200269.8ResignedArchbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
3 Jan 200875.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany

MicroData Summary for Oskar Saier:
Archbishop Oskar Saier (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Freiburg im Breisgau

  • a priest for 50.5 years
  • a bishop for 35.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015