Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Birkhofer

Auxiliary Bishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany

Titular Bishop of Villamagna in Tripolitana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jun 1964 Born
11 May 199126.9Ordained PriestPriest of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
19 Feb 201853.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
19 Feb 201853.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Villamagna in Tripolitana
15 Apr 201853.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Villamagna in Tripolitana

MicroData Summary for Peter Birkhofer (VIAF: 55318085)
Bishop Peter Birkhofer (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Freiburg im Breisgau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceImmenstaad am Bodensee, Archdiocese of Freiburg im Breisgau
Ordained PriestCathedral, Konstanz, Archdiocese of Freiburg im Breisgau
Ordained BishopCathedral, Freiburg im Breisgau, Archdiocese of Freiburg im Breisgau

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Freiburg im Breisgau.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Feb 2018
  • c1+: CB, 19 Feb 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 236, Number 19,762

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast