Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Eugen Viktor Paul Seiterich

Deceased

Archbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1903Born
19 Mar 192623.1Ordained PriestPriest of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
23 Jun 195249.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
23 Jun 195249.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Binda
3 Sep 195249.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Binda
27 Jul 195451.5SelectedArchbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
7 Aug 195451.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
21 Sep 195451.6InstalledArchbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
3 Mar 195855.1DiedArchbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany

MicroData Summary for Eugen Viktor Paul Seiterich
Archbishop Eugen Viktor Paul Seiterich (born , died ) Archbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKarlsruhe

  • a priest for 31.9 years
  • a bishop for 5.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1952, Number 77
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 20, Number 1,090, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast