Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Hermann Josef Schäufele

Deceased

Archbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Nov 1906Born
25 Oct 193124.9Ordained PriestPriest of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
11 Apr 195548.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
11 Apr 195548.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Leptis Magna
11 May 195548.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Leptis Magna
14 May 195851.5SelectedArchbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
14 Jun 195851.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
19 Sep 195851.8InstalledArchbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
26 Jun 197770.6DiedArchbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany

MicroData Summary for Hermann Josef Schäufele (VIAF: 171238789)
Archbishop Hermann Josef Schäufele (born , died ) Archbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStebbach

  • a priest for 45.6 years
  • a bishop for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast