Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Robert Zollitsch

Archbishop Emeritus of Freiburg im Breisgau


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1938 BornFilipovo
27 May 196526.8Ordained PriestPriest of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
16 Jun 200364.9AppointedArchbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
20 Jul 200364.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
17 Sep 201375.1RetiredArchbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany

MicroData Summary for Robert Zollitsch:
Archbishop Robert Zollitsch (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Freiburg im Breisgau

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Freiburg im Breisgau.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,427
  • r: Bollettino, 17 Sep 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 21 Jun 2014