Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Gerber

Bishop of Fulda, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1970 Born
11 May 199727.3Ordained PriestPriest of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
12 Jun 201343.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
12 Jun 201343.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Migirpa
8 Sep 201343.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Migirpa
13 Dec 201848.9AppointedBishop of Fulda, Germany
31 Mar 201949.2InstalledBishop of Fulda, Germany

MicroData Summary for Michael Gerber (VIAF: 55358504)
Bishop Michael Gerber (born ) Bishop of Fulda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOberkirch, Archdiocese of Freiburg im Breisgau
Ordained BishopCathedral, Freiburg im Breisgau, Archdiocese of Freiburg im Breisgau

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Fulda.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Jun 2013
  • ob: MW, 12 Jun 2013
  • c2: CB, 1 Sep 2013
  • c34: CB, 8 Sep 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,865
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Dec 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 21 Dec 2018

Quantcast