Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rainer Klug

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Freiburg im Breisgau

Titular Bishop of Ala Miliaria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1938 BornKonstanz
15 May 196930.4Ordained PriestPriest of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
23 May 200061.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
23 May 200061.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Ala Miliaria
29 Jun 200061.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ala Miliaria
21 Nov 201374.9RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany

MicroData Summary for Rainer Klug:
Bishop Rainer Klug (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Freiburg im Breisgau

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Freiburg im Breisgau.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Number 13,795
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Nov 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 21 Nov 2013