Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Pierre Aimé Marie Doré, P.S.S.

Archbishop Emeritus of Strasbourg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1936 BornLe Grand-Auverné
23 Dec 196125.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Priests of Saint Sulpice
23 Oct 199761.1AppointedArchbishop of Strasbourg, France
23 Nov 199761.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Strasbourg, France
25 Aug 200669.9ResignedArchbishop of Strasbourg, France

MicroData Summary for Joseph Pierre Aimé Marie Doré:
Archbishop Joseph Pierre Aimé Marie Doré P.S.S. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Strasbourg

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Strasbourg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Aug 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,171

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 21 Nov 2013