Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Charles Amarin Brand

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Strasbourg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jun 1920BornMulhouse
11 Jul 194323.0Ordained PriestPriest of Strasbourg, France
28 Dec 197151.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Fréjus-Toulon, France
28 Dec 197151.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Uthina
13 Feb 197251.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Uthina
18 Nov 197656.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Strasbourg, France
30 Jul 198161.1AppointedArchbishop of Monaco
16 Jul 198464.1AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Strasbourg, France
1 Jun 198867.9AppointedArchbishop of Strasbourg, France
23 Oct 199777.3RetiredArchbishop of Strasbourg, France
31 Mar 201392.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Strasbourg, France

MicroData Summary for Charles Amarin Brand:
Archbishop Charles Amarin Brand (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Strasbourg

  • a priest for 69.7 years
  • a bishop for 41.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 2 Apr 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 12 Feb 2014