Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Léon Hégelé

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Strasbourg, France

Titular Bishop of Utica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1925Born
8 Apr 195025.1Ordained PriestPriest of Strasbourg, France
9 Sep 198560.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Strasbourg, France
9 Sep 198560.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Utica
10 Nov 198560.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Utica
18 Dec 200075.8RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Strasbourg, France
11 Feb 201489.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Strasbourg, France

MicroData Summary for Léon Hégelé
Bishop Léon Hégelé (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Strasbourg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontreux-Vieux

  • a priest for 63.8 years
  • a bishop for 28.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 11 Feb 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast