Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Léon-Arthur-Auguste Elchinger

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Strasbourg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jul 1908BornSoufflenheim
4 Apr 193122.8Ordained PriestPriest of Strasbourg, France
17 May 195748.9SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Strasbourg, France
26 Oct 195749.3ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Strasbourg, France
26 Oct 195749.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Antandrus
16 Jan 195849.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Antandrus
30 Dec 196658.5SucceededBishop of Strasbourg, France
16 Jul 198476.0RetiredBishop of Strasbourg, France
27 Jun 199890.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Strasbourg, France

MicroData Summary for Léon-Arthur-Auguste Elchinger:
Bishop Léon-Arthur-Auguste Elchinger (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Strasbourg

  • a priest for 67.2 years
  • a bishop for 40.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 12 Feb 2014