Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alphonse-Gérard Bannwarth

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Soissons (-Laon-Saint-Quentin)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1908BornSteinbrunn-le-Haut
10 Aug 193224.2Ordained PriestPriest of Strasbourg, France
22 May 196355.0AppointedBishop of Soissons (-Laon-Saint-Quentin), France
1 Jul 196355.1Ordained BishopBishop of Soissons (-Laon-Saint-Quentin), France
13 Feb 198475.7RetiredBishop of Soissons (-Laon-Saint-Quentin), France
3 Jan 199182.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Soissons (-Laon-Saint-Quentin), France

MicroData Summary for Alphonse-Gérard Bannwarth:
Bishop Alphonse-Gérard Bannwarth (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Soissons (-Laon-Saint-Quentin)

  • a priest for 58.4 years
  • a bishop for 27.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013