Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jacques-Eugène-Louis Ménager

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Reims, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jul 1912Born
29 Jun 193623.9Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jun 195542.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Versailles, France
23 Jun 195542.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Antiochia Parva
8 Oct 195543.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Antiochia Parva
7 Dec 196149.3AppointedBishop of Meaux, France
13 Jul 197360.9AppointedArchbishop of Reims, France
8 Aug 198876.0RetiredArchbishop of Reims, France
13 Mar 199885.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Reims, France

MicroData Summary for Jacques-Eugène-Louis Ménager (VIAF: 7544723)
Archbishop Jacques-Eugène-Louis Ménager (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Reims

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAnor

  • a priest for 61.7 years
  • a bishop for 42.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 88

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Feb 2017