Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julien François Le Couëdic

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Troyes, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1890Born
29 Jun 191525.4Ordained PriestPriest of Versailles, France
4 Nov 194353.8AppointedBishop of Troyes, France
18 Jan 194454.0Ordained BishopBishop of Troyes, France
21 Feb 196777.1RetiredBishop of Troyes, France
21 Feb 196777.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Flenucleta
10 Dec 197080.9ResignedTitular Bishop of Flenucleta
9 Feb 197585.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Troyes, France

MicroData Summary for Julien François Le Couëdic (VIAF: 37045354)
Bishop Julien François Le Couëdic (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Troyes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVersailles, Diocese of Versailles
Ordained PriestSaint-Louis, Cathedral, Versailles, Diocese of Versailles
Death PlaceVersailles, Diocese of Versailles
Buried Place (Original)Saint-Louis, Cemetery, Versailles, Diocese of Versailles

  • a priest for 59.6 years
  • a bishop for 31.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1944, Number 2
  • c1/opd/loc: AJ, 8 Nov 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast