Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roger Jean Fernand Michon

Deceased

Bishop of Chartres, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1904Born
14 Aug 192723.5Ordained PriestPriest of Versailles, France
12 Feb 195551.0AppointedBishop of Chartres, France
25 Mar 195551.1Ordained BishopBishop of Chartres, France
6 May 197874.2DiedBishop of Chartres, France

MicroData Summary for Roger Jean Fernand Michon (VIAF: 267502389)
Bishop Roger Jean Fernand Michon (born , died ) Bishop of Chartres

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDraveil
Ordained PriestMajor Seminary, Chapel, Versailles, Diocese of Versailles

  • a priest for 50.7 years
  • a bishop for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1955, Number 18
  • c1/opd: AJ, 8 Nov 2017
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 81, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast