Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Ernest Ménard

Deceased

Bishop of Rodez (-Vabres)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1910BornDreux
29 Jul 193524.7Ordained PriestPriest of Chartres, France
14 Apr 195342.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chartres, France
14 Apr 195342.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Alia
11 Jun 195342.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Alia
23 Jan 195544.2AppointedBishop of Rodez (-Vabres), France
28 Jun 197362.6DiedBishop of Rodez (-Vabres), France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Ernest Ménard:
Bishop Jean-Ernest Ménard (born , died ) Bishop of Rodez (-Vabres)

  • a priest for 37.9 years
  • a bishop for 20.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013