Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Florent-Michel-Marie-Joseph du Bois de la Villerabel

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Aix (-Arles-Embrun)

Titular Archbishop of Aenus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1877BornSaint-Brieuc
9 Jun 190022.7Ordained PriestPriest
7 May 192042.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tours, France
7 May 192042.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Aenus
20 Jun 192042.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aenus
21 Nov 192144.1AppointedBishop of Annecy, France
11 May 194062.6AppointedArchbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun), France
13 Dec 194467.2ResignedArchbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun), France
13 Dec 194467.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Aenus
7 Feb 195173.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Aix (-Arles-Embrun), France

MicroData Summary for Florent-Michel-Marie-Joseph du Bois de la Villerabel:
Archbishop Florent-Michel-Marie-Joseph du Bois de la Villerabel (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Aix (-Arles-Embrun)

  • a priest for 50.7 years
  • a bishop for 30.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 39, and Page 57
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1920, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013