Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Léon-Auguste-Marie-Joseph Durand

Deceased

Bishop of Oran


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1878BornOran, Algeria
29 Mar 190223.6Ordained PriestPriest of Marseille, France
10 Jan 191940.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Marseille, France
10 Jan 191940.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Etalonia (Hetalonia)
10 Mar 191940.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Tricomia
3 May 191940.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tricomia
11 Oct 192042.2AppointedBishop of Oran, Algeria
20 Mar 194566.6DiedBishop of Oran, Algeria

MicroData Summary for Léon-Auguste-Marie-Joseph Durand:
Bishop Léon-Auguste-Marie-Joseph Durand (born , died ) Bishop of Oran

  • a priest for 42.9 years
  • a bishop for 25.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • c3+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1919, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015