Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Léon-Albert Terrier

Deceased

Bishop of Bayonne (-Lescar e Oloron), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1893Born
10 Jun 192228.9Ordained PriestPriest
14 Sep 193845.1AppointedBishop of Tarentaise, France
30 Nov 193845.3Ordained BishopBishop of Tarentaise, France
24 Jul 194451.0AppointedBishop of Bayonne (-Lescar e Oloron), France
12 May 195763.8DiedBishop of Bayonne (-Lescar e Oloron), France

MicroData Summary for Léon-Albert Terrier
Bishop Léon-Albert Terrier (born , died ) Bishop of Bayonne (-Lescar e Oloron)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Balme-de-Sillingy

  • a priest for 34.9 years
  • a bishop for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 97

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018