Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pierre-Florent-André du Bois de la Villerabel

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Rouen

Titular Archbishop of Melitene


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1864BornSaujon
17 Jul 188723.1Ordained PriestPriest of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier), France
1 Jun 191550.9AppointedBishop of Amiens, France
29 Jul 191551.1Ordained BishopBishop of Amiens, France
10 Aug 191551.1InstalledBishop of Amiens, France
16 Dec 192056.5AppointedArchbishop of Rouen, France
31 Jan 192156.6InstalledArchbishop of Rouen, France
6 Jul 193672.0ResignedArchbishop of Rouen, France
6 Jul 193672.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Melitene
3 Jan 193873.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Rouen, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Florent-André du Bois de la Villerabel:
Archbishop Pierre-Florent-André du Bois de la Villerabel (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Rouen

  • a priest for 50.5 years
  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 51
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1915, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013