Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Auguste Grumel

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1863BornChambéry
18 Dec 188623.8Ordained PriestPriest of Chambéry, France
3 Feb 192460.9AppointedBishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France
27 Mar 192461.1Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France
11 Apr 192461.1InstalledBishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France
14 Mar 194683.0DiedBishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France

MicroData Summary for Auguste Grumel:
Bishop Auguste Grumel (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne

  • a priest for 59.2 years
  • a bishop for 21.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1924, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015