Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Jean-Yves Marcadé

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Laval

Titular Bishop of Bargala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1894BornCorseul
14 Jun 191924.6Ordained PriestPriest
20 Aug 193641.7AppointedBishop of Laval, France
29 Oct 193641.9Ordained BishopBishop of Laval, France
10 Jul 193843.6ResignedBishop of Laval, France
10 Jul 193843.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Bargala
7 May 195964.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Laval, France

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Jean-Yves Marcadé:
Bishop Joseph-Jean-Yves Marcadé (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Laval

  • a priest for 39.9 years
  • a bishop for 22.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1936, Number 78

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013