Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cosme-Benjamin Jorcin

Deceased

Bishop of Digne (-Riez-Sisteron), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1874Born
19 Dec 189622.6Ordained PriestPriest
23 Dec 192349.6AppointedBishop of Digne (-Riez-Sisteron), France
20 Mar 192449.8Ordained BishopBishop of Digne (-Riez-Sisteron), France
10 Apr 192449.9InstalledBishop of Digne (-Riez-Sisteron), France
20 Dec 195884.6DiedBishop of Digne (-Riez-Sisteron), France

MicroData Summary for Cosme-Benjamin Jorcin
Bishop Cosme-Benjamin Jorcin (born , died ) Bishop of Digne (-Riez-Sisteron)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLanslebourg

  • a priest for 62.0 years
  • a bishop for 34.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1924, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017