Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste-Adrien Llosa

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ajaccio, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1884Born
21 Sep 190723.2Ordained PriestPriest
14 Sep 193854.1AppointedBishop of Ajaccio, France
9 Nov 193854.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ajaccio, France
26 Jul 196682.0RetiredBishop of Ajaccio, France
26 Jul 196682.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Taborenta
18 Feb 197186.6ResignedTitular Bishop of Taborenta
12 Mar 197590.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Ajaccio, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste-Adrien Llosa
Bishop Jean-Baptiste-Adrien Llosa (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ajaccio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDraguignan

  • a priest for 67.4 years
  • a bishop for 36.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 91

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017