Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Antoine Fabre

Deceased

Bishop of Marseille, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1844Born
2 Jun 186723.2Ordained PriestPriest of Marseille, France
29 Apr 190965.1AppointedBishop of Marseille, France
16 Jun 190965.2Ordained BishopBishop of Marseille, France
9 Jan 192378.8DiedBishop of Marseille, France

MicroData Summary for Joseph Antoine Fabre
Bishop Joseph Antoine Fabre (born , died ) Bishop of Marseille

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Ciotat

  • a priest for 55.6 years
  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1909, Number 32
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 244

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017