Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Auguste-Callixte-Jean Bonnabel

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Gap

Titular Bishop of Zuri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1886BornBaratier
29 Jun 191225.5Ordained PriestPriest of Gap, France
16 Aug 193245.6AppointedBishop of Gap, France
26 Oct 193245.8Ordained BishopBishop of Gap, France
13 Feb 196174.1RetiredBishop of Gap, France
13 Feb 196174.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Zuri
7 Nov 196780.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Gap, France

MicroData Summary for Auguste-Callixte-Jean Bonnabel:
Bishop Auguste-Callixte-Jean Bonnabel (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Gap

  • a priest for 55.3 years
  • a bishop for 35.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1932, Number 74

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015