Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Camille Pic

Deceased

Bishop of Valence (-Die-Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1876BornAllan
7 Jul 190124.5Ordained PriestPriest
17 Dec 192852.0AppointedBishop of Gap, France
12 Mar 192952.2Ordained BishopBishop of Gap, France
16 Aug 193255.6AppointedBishop of Valence (-Die-Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux), France
25 Nov 195174.9DiedBishop of Valence (-Die-Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux), France

MicroData Summary for Camille Pic:
Bishop Camille Pic (born , died ) Bishop of Valence (-Die-Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux)

  • a priest for 50.3 years
  • a bishop for 22.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1929, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015