Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
15 Oct 1932 | Born | ||
15 Apr 1956 | 23.5 | Ordained Priest | Priest |
26 Jun 1978 | 45.6 | Appointed | Auxiliary Bishop of Soissons (-Laon-Saint-Quentin), France |
26 Jun 1978 | 45.6 | Appointed | Titular Bishop of Fata |
17 Sep 1978 | 45.9 | Ordained Bishop | Titular Bishop of Fata |
16 Feb 1984 | 51.3 | Appointed | Bishop of Soissons (-Laon-Saint-Quentin), France |
25 Mar 1998 | 65.4 | Appointed | Bishop of Créteil, France |
4 Sep 2007 | 74.8 | Retired | Bishop of Créteil, France |
19 Apr 2015 | 82.5 | Appointed | Apostolic Administrator of Soissons (-Laon-Saint-Quentin), France |
20 Dec 2015 | 83.1 | Ceased | Apostolic Administrator of Soissons (-Laon-Saint-Quentin), France |
31 Dec 2022 | 90.2 | Died | Bishop Emeritus of Créteil, France |
Daniel Camille Victor Marie Labille
Bishop
Daniel Camille Victor Marie
Labille
(born , died )
Bishop Emeritus
of Créteil
|
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Nouvion-sur-Meuse, Archdiocese of Reims |
Ordained Bishop | Cathedral, Soissons, Diocese of Soissons (-Laon-Saint-Quentin) |
Death Place | Charleville-Meizères, Archdiocese of Reims |
External Link(s): |
Source(s):
|
![]()
Home |
Countries | Religious
Men
Women |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
![]() |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025 Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025 |
✠