Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean François Marie Streiff

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nevers, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1911Born
18 Jul 193725.6Ordained PriestPriest
21 Sep 196654.7AppointedBishop of Nevers, France
21 Nov 196654.9Ordained BishopBishop of Nevers, France
8 Jul 198775.5RetiredBishop of Nevers, France
9 Jul 199987.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Nevers, France

MicroData Summary for Jean François Marie Streiff
Bishop Jean François Marie Streiff (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nevers

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNancy

  • a priest for 61.9 years
  • a bishop for 32.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018