Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph-Marie Sardou, S.C.J. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Monaco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1922Born
12 Mar 194926.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congrégation du Sacré-Coeur
31 May 198562.5AppointedArchbishop of Monaco
30 Sep 198562.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Monaco
16 May 200077.5RetiredArchbishop of Monaco
19 Sep 200986.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Monaco

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Marie Sardou
Archbishop Joseph-Marie Sardou S.C.J. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Monaco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarseille, France

  • a priest for 60.5 years
  • a bishop for 23.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast