Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Pierre Grallet, O.F.M.

Archbishop Emeritus of Strasbourg, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1941 Born
17 Sep 196524.3ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
15 Sep 196827.3Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor
28 Jun 196928.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
27 Sep 200463.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Strasbourg, France
27 Sep 200463.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Dardanus
23 Oct 200463.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dardanus
21 Apr 200765.9AppointedArchbishop of Strasbourg, France
13 May 200765.9InstalledArchbishop of Strasbourg, France
18 Feb 201775.7RetiredArchbishop of Strasbourg, France

MicroData Summary
Jean-Pierre Grallet
Archbishop Jean-Pierre Grallet O.F.M.
(born )
Archbishop Emeritus of Strasbourg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRozelieures in Lorena

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Strasbourg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Number 14,705
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Apr 2007
  • i: CB
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Feb 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 12 Apr 2025