Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Marie Antoine Joseph Speich

Apostolic Nuncio to Slovenia

Titular Archbishop of Sulci

Apostolic Delegate to Kosovo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1955 Born
9 Oct 198227.3Ordained PriestPriest of Strasbourg, France
17 Aug 201358.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Ghana
17 Aug 201358.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Sulci
24 Oct 201358.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Sulci
19 Mar 201963.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Slovenia
19 Mar 201963.7AppointedApostolic Delegate to Kosovo

MicroData Summary for Jean-Marie Antoine Joseph Speich (VIAF: 296057440)
Archbishop Jean-Marie Antoine Joseph Speich (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Slovenia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStrasbourg
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Cathedral, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Slovenia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Aug 2013
  • ob/c2+: CB, 30 Aug 2013
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 2,013, Number 144
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,977
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Mar 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 30 May 2021

Quantcast