Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emmanuel Kofi Fianu, S.V.D.

Bishop of Ho, Ghana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1957 Born
8 Sep 198023.2ProfessedMember of Society of the Divine Word
8 Sep 198427.2Perpetual VowsMember of Society of the Divine Word
14 Jul 198528.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
14 Jul 201558.0AppointedBishop of Ho, Ghana
3 Oct 201558.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ho, Ghana
7 Apr 201658.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Keta-Akatsi, Ghana
13 May 201759.9CeasedApostolic Administrator of Keta-Akatsi, Ghana

MicroData Summary for Emmanuel Kofi Fianu
Bishop Emmanuel Kofi Fianu S.V.D. (born ) Bishop of Ho

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTegbi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ho.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Jul 2015
  • c1: CB, 15 Jul 2015
  • ob/c2+: CB, 4 Aug 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,584
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 Apr 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 May 2017