Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Keta-Akatsi

Dioecesis Ketaensis-Akatsiensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Split: 19 December 1994
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Accra
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Ghana
  • Square Kilometers: 7,470 (2,885 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, P.O. Box 90, Akatsi, Volta Region, Ghana
  • Telephone: (966)444.25
  • Fax: 442.41

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Volta Inferiore
15 March 1923ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Costa d’Oro {Gold Coast}
Vicariate Apostolic of Togo
Vicariate Apostolic of Volta Inferiore (erected)
Diocese of Keta
18 April 1950ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Volta Inferiore Diocese of Keta
23 April 1956Territory LostDiocese of Keta
Diocese of Tamale
Diocese of Navrongo (erected)
Diocese of Keta-Ho
20 June 1975Name ChangedDiocese of Keta Diocese of Keta-Ho
19 December 1994SplitDiocese of Keta-Ho Diocese of Ho
Diocese of Keta-Akatsi
19 December 1994Territory LostDiocese of Keta-Ho Diocese of Jasikan (erected)
Diocese of Keta-Akatsi
19 December 1994SplitDiocese of Keta-Ho Diocese of Ho
Diocese of Keta-Akatsi

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Keta
195079,064680,41011.6%430342,3251614ap1951
1970237,149947,00025.0%171713,9491723ap1971
Diocese of Keta-Ho
1980286,612998,00028.7%2918476,098182625ap1981
1990335,3921,385,12124.2%7110814,140115230ap1991
Diocese of Keta-Akatsi
1999112,723650,00017.3%2510353,220122010ap2000
2000114,488650,00017.6%2710373,094121610ap2001
2001115,632663,00017.4%299383,042101810ap2002
2002120,032663,00018.1%289373,244101911ap2003
2003116,778659,59817.7%288363,24391510ap2004
2004117,998753,42415.7%298373,18991610ap2005
2006120,271785,00015.3%326383,16571810ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.1, 5 Sep 2012; data: 19 Sep 2012