Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel Edoe Kumordji, S.V.D.

Bishop of Keta-Akatsi, Ghana

Vicar Apostolic of Donkorkrom


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1956 Born
8 Dec 198024.7ProfessedMember of Society of the Divine Word
14 Jul 198529.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
12 Jun 200751.2AppointedPrefect of Donkorkrom, Ghana
19 Jan 201053.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Donkorkrom, Ghana
19 Jan 201053.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Ita
17 Apr 201054.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ita
16 Mar 201760.9AppointedBishop of Keta-Akatsi, Ghana

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Edoe Kumordji
Bishop Gabriel Edoe Kumordji S.V.D. (born ) Bishop of Keta-Akatsi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAccra

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Keta-Akatsi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Jun 2007
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Jan 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Number 16,624
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Mar 2017
  • c1: CB, 19 Mar 2017
  • ab: CB, 31 Mar 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 Apr 2017