Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Dominic Kodwo Andoh

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Accra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1929BornShama
23 Dec 195627.6Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jul 197142.1AppointedBishop of Accra, Ghana
3 Oct 197142.4Ordained BishopBishop of Accra, Ghana
6 Jul 199263.1AppointedArchbishop of Accra, Ghana
30 Mar 200575.9RetiredArchbishop of Accra, Ghana
17 May 201384.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Accra, Ghana

MicroData Summary for Dominic Kodwo Andoh:
Archbishop Dominic Kodwo Andoh (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Accra

  • a priest for 56.4 years
  • a bishop for 41.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 6 Aug 2015