Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Martin Darko

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sekondi-Takoradi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1945BornAboadze
25 Jul 197631.2Ordained PriestPriest of Sekondi-Takoradi, Ghana
27 Jun 199853.1AppointedBishop of Sekondi-Takoradi, Ghana
10 Oct 199853.4Ordained BishopBishop of Sekondi-Takoradi, Ghana
14 Dec 201166.5ResignedBishop of Sekondi-Takoradi, Ghana
12 Jan 201367.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Sekondi-Takoradi, Ghana

MicroData Summary for John Martin Darko:
Bishop John Martin Darko (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sekondi-Takoradi

  • a priest for 36.5 years
  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Number 13,442
  • r: Bollettino, 14 Dec 2011
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: CB, 14 Jan 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013