Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Tamale

Archidioecesis Tamalensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Philip Naameh, Archbishop
  • Gregory E. Kpiebaya, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 30 May 1977
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Ghana
  • Square Kilometers: 7,383 (2,851 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Archbishop's House, P.O. Box TL 42, Gumbehini Rd., Tamale, N.R., Ghana
  • Telephone: (037)20.22.425
  • Fax: (same)

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Navrongo
11 January 1926ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Ouagadougou Prefecture Apostolic of Navrongo (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Navrongo
26 February 1934ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Navrongo Vicariate Apostolic of Navrongo
Diocese of Tamale
18 April 1950ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Navrongo Diocese of Tamale
23 April 1956Territory LostDiocese of Keta
Diocese of Tamale
Diocese of Navrongo (erected)
3 November 1959Territory LostDiocese of Tamale Diocese of Wa (erected)
Archdiocese of Tamale
30 May 1977ElevatedDiocese of Tamale Archdiocese of Tamale
3 February 1995Territory LostArchdiocese of Tamale Diocese of Damongo (erected)
16 March 1999Territory LostArchdiocese of Tamale Diocese of Yendi (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Tamale
195033,0803311,026318ap1951
19708,093470,0001.7%3333245381610ap1971
Archdiocese of Tamale
198015,020780,0001.9%24143349604315ap1981
199023,371862,0002.7%243256417694916ap1991
199911,407605,0001.9%261844259834112ap2000
200019,1341,171,0001.6%25184344487389ap2001
200114,718703,4882.1%28154334229358ap2002
200215,168703,4882.2%32144632976398ap2003
200315,912703,4882.3%30144436182398ap2004
200416,506703,4882.3%32144635882399ap2005
201020,567816,0002.5%351853388823911ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.0, 29 Jul 2012; data: 19 Aug 2012