Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Oscar Morin, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Navrongo, Ghana

Titular Bishop of Uthina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1878Born
28 Jun 190526.5Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
14 Apr 192647.3AppointedPrefect of Navrongo, Ghana
26 Feb 193455.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Uthina
26 Feb 193455.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Navrongo, Ghana
19 Apr 193455.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Uthina
15 Apr 194768.3ResignedVicar Apostolic of Navrongo, Ghana
6 Apr 195273.2DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Navrongo, Ghana

MicroData Summary for Oscar Morin
Bishop Oscar Morin M. Afr. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Navrongo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSainte-Cunégonde, Canada

  • a priest for 46.7 years
  • a bishop for 17.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1951
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1934, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017