Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gérard Bertrand, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Navrongo, Ghana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jan 1911Born
11 Jun 193827.3Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
10 Jun 194837.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Navrongo, Ghana
10 Jun 194837.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Abitinae
20 Oct 194837.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abitinae
18 Apr 195039.2AppointedBishop of Tamale, Ghana
12 Apr 195746.2AppointedBishop of Navrongo, Ghana
13 Apr 197362.2ResignedBishop of Navrongo, Ghana
23 Jan 197664.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Navrongo, Ghana

MicroData Summary for Gérard Bertrand
Bishop Gérard Bertrand M. Afr. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Navrongo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontréal, Canada

  • a priest for 37.6 years
  • a bishop for 27.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 112

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018