Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Alphonse Asiedu, S.V.D.

Vicar Apostolic of Donkorkrom, Ghana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1962 Born
21 Sep 199129.3First VowsMember of Society of the Divine Word
8 Sep 199634.3Perpetual VowsMember of Society of the Divine Word
19 Jul 199735.1Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
11 Feb 201956.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Donkorkrom, Ghana
4 May 201956.9Ordained BishopVicar Apostolic of Donkorkrom, Ghana

MicroData Summary for John Alphonse Asiedu
Bishop John Alphonse Asiedu S.V.D. (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Donkorkrom

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAdeemmra, Afram Plains
Ordained DeaconSt. Victor's Major, Seminary, Tamale
Ordained PriestHoly Spirit, Cathedral, Accra, Archdiocese of Accra
Ordained BishopSt. Francis Xavier, Donkorkrom, Vicariate Apostolic of Donkorkrom

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Donkorkrom.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Feb 2019
  • firs/perp/c01/lo: CB, 11 Feb 2019
  • ob: CB, 4 Mar 2019
  • c2+: CB, 9 Mar 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 4 May 2019

Quantcast