Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrej Saje

Bishop of Novo Mesto, Slovenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1966 Born
29 Jun 199226.1Ordained PriestPriest of Ljubljana, Slovenia
30 Jun 202155.1AppointedBishop of Novo Mesto, Slovenia
26 Sep 202155.4Ordained BishopBishop of Novo Mesto, Slovenia
28 Sep 202155.4InstalledBishop of Novo Mesto, Slovenia

MicroData Summary for Andrej Saje (VIAF: 267340676)
Bishop Andrej Saje (born ) Bishop of Novo Mesto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNovo Mesto, Archdiocese of Ljubljana
Ordained BishopSv. Kancijan, Church, Mirna Peč, Diocese of Novo Mesto

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Novo Mesto.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Jun 2021
  • ob: CB, 30 Jun 2021
  • ob.loc: AM, 24 Aug 2021
  • c2+: CB, 19 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 27 Sep 2021

Quantcast