Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josef Marketz

Bishop of Gurk, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jul 1955 Born
1 Mar 198024.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Gurk, Austria
29 Jun 198226.9Ordained PriestPriest of Gurk, Austria
3 Dec 201964.3AppointedBishop of Gurk, Austria
2 Feb 202064.5Ordained BishopBishop of Gurk, Austria

MicroData Summary for Josef Marketz
Bishop Josef Marketz (born ) Bishop of Gurk

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSt. Philippen ob Sonnegg, Diocese of Gurk
Ordained BishopCathedral, Klagenfurt

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Gurk.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2: CB, 3 Dec 2019
  • c34: CB, 16 Jan 2020
  • od: CB, 2 Feb 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.6, 19 Dec 2019; Data: 3 Feb 2020

Quantcast