Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giampiero Gloder

Apostolic Nuncio to Cuba

Titular Archbishop of Telde


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 May 1958 Born
4 Jun 198325.0Ordained PriestPriest of Padova {Padua}, Italy
21 Sep 201355.3AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy
21 Sep 201355.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Telde
24 Oct 201355.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Telde
20 Dec 201456.5AppointedVice-Chamberlain of the Apostolic Chamber
11 Oct 201961.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Cuba

MicroData Summary for Giampiero Gloder (VIAF: 238673346)
Archbishop Giampiero Gloder (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Cuba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAsiago, Diocese of Padova {Padua}, Italy
Ordained PriestSanta Maria Assunta, Cathedral Basilica, Padova, Diocese of Padova {Padua}, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Cuba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Sep 2013
  • ob/c2: CB, 26 Sep 2013
  • c34: CB, 2 Oct 2013
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 2,013, Number 145
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,978
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Dec 2014
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Oct 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 1 May 2020

Quantcast