Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Paul Vesco, O.P.

Bishop of Oran


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1962 BornLyon, France
14 Sep 199634.5ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
24 Jun 200139.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
1 Dec 201250.7AppointedBishop of Oran, Algeria
25 Jan 201350.9Ordained BishopBishop of Oran, Algeria

MicroData Summary for Jean-Paul Vesco:
Bishop Jean-Paul Vesco O.P. (born ) Bishop of Oran

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Oran.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Dec 2012
  • ob/c2: CB, 5 Dec 2012
  • c34: CB, 27 Jan 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Number 17,648

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 5 Apr 2014