Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alphonse Émile Georger

Bishop Emeritus of Oran


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1936 BornSarreguemines, France
29 Jun 196529.1Ordained PriestPriest of Alger, Algeria
10 Jul 199862.1AppointedBishop of Oran, Algeria
16 Aug 199862.2Ordained BishopBishop of Oran, Algeria
1 Dec 201276.5RetiredBishop of Oran, Algeria

MicroData Summary for Alphonse Émile Georger:
Bishop Alphonse Émile Georger (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Oran

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Oran.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,370
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Dec 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013