Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ghaleb Moussa Abdalla Bader

Apostolic Nuncio to Dominican Republic

Titular Archbishop of Mathara in Numidia

Apostolic Delegate to Puerto Rico


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jul 1951 Born
13 Jun 197523.8Ordained PriestPriest of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
24 May 200856.8AppointedArchbishop of Alger, Algeria
17 Jul 200856.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Alger, Algeria
23 May 201563.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Pakistan
23 May 201563.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Mathara in Numidia
24 Aug 201766.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Dominican Republic
24 Aug 201766.0AppointedApostolic Delegate to Puerto Rico

MicroData Summary for Ghaleb Moussa Abdalla Bader
Archbishop Ghaleb Moussa Abdalla Bader (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Dominican Republic

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKhirbeh, Jordan

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Dominican Republic.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 May 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,932
  • ab: Bollettino, 23 May 2015
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Aug 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 Aug 2017