Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Michel Sabbah

Patriarch Emeritus of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1933 Born
29 Jun 195522.2Ordained PriestPriest of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
11 Dec 198754.7AppointedPatriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
6 Jan 198854.7Ordained BishopPatriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
21 Jun 200875.2RetiredPatriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine

MicroData Summary for Michel Sabbah
Patriarch Michel Sabbah (born ) Patriarch Emeritus of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNazareth

Please contact the Patriarch through the Patriarchate of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Jun 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,421
  • opd: CB, 29 Nov 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 1 Dec 2018

Quantcast