Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Maroun Elias Nimeh Lahham

Auxiliary Bishop of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}

Titular Archbishop of Medaba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1948 BornIrbed, Jordan
24 Jun 197223.9Ordained PriestPriest of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
8 Sep 200557.1AppointedBishop of Tunis, Tunisia
2 Oct 200557.2Ordained BishopBishop of Tunis, Tunisia
22 May 201061.8AppointedArchbishop of Tunis, Tunisia
19 Jan 201263.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
19 Jan 201263.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Medaba

MicroData Summary for Maroun Elias Nimeh Lahham:
Archbishop Maroun Elias Nimeh Lahham (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}

Please contact the Archbishop through the Patriarchate of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Sep 2005
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Number 14,995
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 May 2010
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Jan 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013